SHRI GURU RAVIDASS CULTURAL ASSOCIATION BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RESEARCH AND PROPAGATE THE TEACHINGS AND PHILOSOPHY OF SHRI GURU RAVIDASS JI TO THE RAVIDASSIA COMMUNITY AND ALL OTHERS WHO ARE INTERESTED. THE CHARITY SEEKS TO ACHIEVE ITS OBJECTIVES BY USING THE FUNDS TO PROVIDE BETTER FACILITIES FOR THE USERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

25 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 25 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohinder Pal | Chair | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Kaur | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dharm Singh | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rashpal Singh | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jasbinder Kaur Gen Sec | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Kumar Mann | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ram Asra | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rajinder Kumar Mehmi | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amrish Kumar | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sukwinder Suman | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pankaj Mohan | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gian Singh Bange | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kamal Kumar | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Varinder Kumar | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amarnath Seniaray Vice Chair | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shambhu Dayal Claire Treasurer | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kulwant Dass | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nirmal Badan | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lalit Kumar Bangar | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bhupinder Pal | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hargopal Lal | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harbhajan Lal | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Satnam Chumber | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amrik Chand Salan Custodian | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raj Kumar Custodian | Trustee | 09 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287.59k | £480.18k | £132.63k | £138.62k | £313.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.39k | £409.99k | £146.82k | £136.12k | £284.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 273 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 April 2023 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 SEPTEMBER 1971 as amended on 18 Jun 2004
Charitable objects
1 TO PROVIDE SUITABLE PREMISES TO BE KNOWN AS RAVIDAS BHAVAN 2 TO RESEARCH AND PROPAGATE THE TEACHINGS AND PHILOSOPHY OF SHRI GURU RAVINDASS JI 3 TO INVEST THE MONEYS OF THE INSTITUTION NOT IMMEDIATELY REQUIRED FOR ITS PURPOSES IN OR UPON SUCH INVESTMENTS SECURITIES OR PROPERTY AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIR, SUBJECT NEVERTHELESS TO SUCH CONDITIONS (IF ANY) AND SUCH CONSENTS (IF ANY) AS MAY FOR THE TIME BEING BE IMPOSED OR REQUIRED BY LAW AND SUBJECT ALSO HEREINAFTER PROVIDED 4 TO BORROW OR RAISE ANY MONEY FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE INSTITUTION ON SUCH TERMS AND ON SUCH SECURITY AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT 5 TO SELL LET MORTGAGE DISPOSE OF OR TURN TO ACCOUNT ALL OR ANY OF THE PROPERTY OR ASSETS OF THE INSTITUTION AS MAY BE THOUGHT EXPEDIENT WITH A VIEW TO THE PROMOTION OF ITS OBJECTS 6 TO AFFORD FACILITIES FOR ASSOCIATION AMONG THEMSELVES OF SUCH CITIZENS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA AS SHALL BECOME MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTION AND TO MAINTAIN GOOD RELATIONS, UNDERSTANDING AND CO-OPERATION AMONG THE MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTION FOR THE PURPOSE OF FURTHERING THEIR SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND CULTURAL PROGRESS ADVANCEMENT 7 TO PROMOTE THE MUTUAL SUPPORT AND CO-OPERATION OF CITIZENS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA WHO ARE RESIDENT IN ENGLAND FOR THEIR MUTUAL ADVANTAGE 8 TO ENCOURAGE THE MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTION AND OTHER CITIZENS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA IN ENGLAND TO MAKE EFFORTS DIRECTED TO THEIR SOCIAL IMPROVEMENT AND EDUCATION BOTH GENERAL AND IN MATTERS OF ART, MUSIC AND OTHER CULTURAL ACTIVITIES AND TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL AD SPORTING ACTIVITIES AND FOR SUCH PURPOSES TO PROVIDE SUCH FACILITIES FOR ANY SUCH ACTIVITIES AS MAY BE THOUGHT CONVENIENT 9 TO ARRANGE CELEBRATIONS ON OCCASIONS OF NATIONAL IMPORTANCE TO CITIZENS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA AND ON BIRTHDAYS OF THE RELIGIOUS OR NATIONAL LEADERS OF SUCH REPUBLIC 10 TO GIVE ADVICE TO CITIZENS OF THE REPUBLIC OF INDIA ON ALL QUESTIONS WITH WHICH SUCH CITIZENS ARE CONCERNED BY REASON OF THEIR RESIDENCE OR OTHER ACTIVITIES IN ENGLAND 11 TO ESTABLISH SUPPORT MAINTAIN AND CONTRIBUTE TO ANY BENEVOLENT SIMILAR FUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY PERSONS 12 TO UNDERTAKE AND EXECUTE ANY TRUSTS WHICH MAY LAWFULLY BE UNDERTAKEN BY THE INSTITUTION AND MAY BE CONDUCIVE TO ITS OBJECT 13 TO ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT OR AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF ANY CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS AND TO SUBSCRIBE OR GUARANTEE MONEY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ANY WAY CONNECTED WITH THE PURPOSES OF THE INSTITUTION OR CALCULATED TO FURTHER ITS OBJECTS 14 TO ENGAGE AND PAY A PRIEST OR ANY OTHER PERSONS TO CARRY OUT OR ASSIST IN CARRYING OUT THE WORK OF THE INSTITUTION 15 TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OF CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Guru Ravidass Bhawan Birmingham
1 Union Row
Birmingham
Birmingham
West Midlands
B21 9EN
- Phone:
- 01215548761
- Email:
- admin@gururavidassbhawan.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window