THE BRIAN HAYNES CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Micro-credit core funding. Equipment for Vocational Secondary School. Funding for Agricultural project. Funding for Health Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Bangladesh
- Burma
- India
- Kenya
- Peru
- Rwanda
- Uganda
Governance
- 31 March 2008: Standard registration
- 28 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.60k | £16.13k | £22.62k | £11.24k | £188 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.73k | £11.58k | £7.50k | £23.50k | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 18 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 01 July 2019 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 03 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 18 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PROMOTION OF HEALTH IN AFRICA AND ELSEWHERE IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING CORE FINANCE TO ENABLE MICRO FINANCE INSTITUTIONS TO PROVIDE POOR PEOPLE WHO WOULD OTHERWISE NOT HAVE ACCESS TO LOANS WITH ASSISTANCE IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF SMALL BUSINESSES AND/OR TEMPORARY SUPPORT FOR SMALL BUSINESSES OWNED BY AND PRIMARILY EMPLOYING POOR PERSONS WHERE THERE IS OTHERWISE INSUFFICIENT ALTERNATIVE EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window