THE SKOLKOVO FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the charity is to provide public benefit and in particular to advance the education of the public with specific focus on the work of the Moscow School of Management providing funding for: - the school's maintenance costs; - developing a research facility and infrastructure; - educational programmes; - conferences, publications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Russia
Governance
- 22 February 2008: Standard registration
- 30 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.28k | £3.82k | £3.00k | £5.37k | £6.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £641.52k | £63.61k | £421.70k | £23.80k | £25.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 16 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 29 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 13 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 20 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE WORK OF THE MOSCOW SCHOOL OF MANAGEMENT, SKOLKOVO
Area of benefit
SKOLKOVO
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window