FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR MEDICAL STUDENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Main activity is fund raising to finance deserving medical students in Pakistan. The usual main event is the FAMS Annual Dinner. However thorughout the year donations do come in small amounts. Appeal for donations are also made through media
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Pakistan
Governance
- 14 April 2008: Standard registration
- FAMS UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Bushera Choudry | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|||||
DR Lalarukh Khan | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR Huma Ghauri | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ARSHAD JAVED | Trustee |
|
||||||
DR AAMIR AYUB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/04/2020 | 12/04/2021 | 12/04/2022 | 12/04/2023 | 12/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.45k | £86.73k | £156.99k | £229.11k | £290.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.65k | £73.78k | £175.77k | £232.42k | £223.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 April 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 April 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 April 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 April 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 26 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEDICAL STUDENTS IN PAKISTAN BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE THEIR STUDIES
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 GREEN GATE
HALE BARNS
ALTRINCHAM
WA15 0SN
- Phone:
- 07766711552
- Email:
- info@fams.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window