CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Construction & Development Partnership is a construction industry led development charity enabling social and technical development through built environment projects. We endeavour to build developments that: utilise local labour and natural material resources, support the local economy, incorporate local knowledge, educate young people and promote the well being of all our partners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 25 April 2008: Standard registration
- CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT PARTNERSHIP (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Francois | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Papa Sekyi-Djan | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Atkinson | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD PHILLIPS | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDITH DAVID | Trustee | 08 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARK WHITBY BSC FRENG | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR SEB WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.97k | £21.78k | £18.72k | £17.74k | £6.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.27k | £16.30k | £13.75k | £17.82k | £15.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 January 2024 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND/OR ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF LEARNING AND LITERACY CENTRES
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitby Wood Ltd
91-94 Lower Marsh
LONDON
SE1 7AB
- Phone:
- 07894203518
- Email:
- info@codep.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window