Financial history SOUTH LONDON SPECIAL LEAGUE

Charity Number: 1124629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £65.33k £25.46k £93.54k £40.40k £50.34k
Total expenditure £56.41k £46.39k £81.98k £70.83k £66.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A