KAIROS PARTNERSHIP LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering help and advise to faith based groups to support their communities. That means that we can help you start new projects or develop your existing project into something larger.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
Governance
- 07 June 2010: Standard registration
- 13 May 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 13 May 2025: Funds transferred to 501978 HEREFORD DIOCESAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND COUNCIL FOR SO...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £6 | £105 | £193 | £3.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/11/2012
Charitable objects
1 THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF RURAL OR URBAN REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE DIOCESE OF HEREFORD AND ANY BORDERING DIOCESES AND AREAS OVERSEAS WHERE THE HEREFORD DIOCESE HAS ESTABLISHED WORKING RELATIONSHIPS AND RESPONSIBILITIES) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING TO GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS WHO INTEND SETTING UP DEVELOPING THEIR OWN COMMUNITY BUSINESSES B THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE AND BUILDINGS INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) CHURCH AND ECCLESIASTICAL BUILDINGS C THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING D THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES E THE PRESERVATION, IMPROVEMENT OR ADAPTATION FOR ANY OF THE PURPOSES WITHIN THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE, AND ESPECIALLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) CHURCHES AND ECCLESIASTICAL BUILDINGS, AND THE PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT F THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY TO DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND GEOGRAPHIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES G SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES 2 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE HEREFORD DIOCESE AND SURROUNDING AREA, AND IN AREAS OVERSEAS WHERE THE HEREFORD DIOCESE HAS ESTABLISHED WORKING RELATIONSHIPS AND RESPONSIBILITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY 3 TO PROMOTE THE AREA COVERED BY THE DIOCESE OF HEREFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, AND IN AREAS OVERSEAS WHERE THE HEREFORD DIOCESE HAS ESTABLISHED WORKING RELATIONSHIPS AND RESPONSIBILITIES TO PROVIDE RELIEF FROM SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE AND TO GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITIES IN ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ITS RESIDENTS OF ALL AGES; AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE AFOREMENTIONED RESIDENTS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE LIFE OF THEIR COMMUNITY IN WAYS WHICH ADDRESS AND ALLEVIATE SOCIAL ECONOMIC AND GEOGRAPHIC DISADVANTAGE
Area of benefit
HEREFORD DIOCESE AND SURROUNDING AREA, AND IN AREAS OVERSEAS WHERE THE HEREFORD DIOCESE HAS ESTABLISHED WORKING RELATIONSHIPS AND RESPONSIBILITIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window