Giving Sadaqah

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Empowers orphans and poor families across the globe to promote sustainable change by providing access to education and dedicated programmes such as building wells, microfinancing, providing staple food baskets which help children(mainly orphans) the poor and needy. Giving Sadaqah also works in the UK to help recycle clothes and organises Food Banks for those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Ethiopia
- Somalia
Governance
- 12 April 2008: Standard registration
- HOPE REGENERATION AFRICA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZAHRA NUR | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdirahman Amin | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mukhtar Handule | Trustee | 15 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.83k | £96.54k | £144.77k | £92.54k | £92.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.75k | £90.64k | £145.58k | £90.18k | £82.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2021
(These accounts |
30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 14 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 14 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 FEBRUARY 2008 as amended on 28 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE FROM SPECIFIC REGIONS OF AFRICA BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE PEOPLE OF AFRICA COMMUNITIES IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
83
High Street
Harlesden
London
NW10 4NT
- Phone:
- 08000209500
- Email:
- givingsadaqah@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window