GRAYSHOTT CRICKET CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote cricket at all levels within the local community. To manage the cricket facilities at the sportsfield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 21 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toby John Joyce | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Grant | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Curry | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Foulds | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Willows | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Phil Coleshill | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.52k | £75.21k | £49.23k | £79.31k | £101.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.27k | £77.22k | £38.90k | £81.84k | £103.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.85k | £36.78k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION (ADOPTED) 19 APRIL 2008 as amended on 06 Dec 2019 as amended on 03 Dec 2021 as amended on 02 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE EAST HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grayshott Cricket Club
Grayshott Sports Pavilion
Beech Hanger Road
Grayshott
HINDHEAD
Surrey
- Phone:
- 07464321031
- Email:
- treasurer@grayshottcc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window