TENTERDEN AND DISTRICT DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1122971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Tenterden Day Centre helps elderly, disabled and dementia sufferers to overcome difficulties giving them an opportunity to take part in as many varied activities as possible. Core activities ensure people maintain their independence through informed choices whilst retaining their individuality, dignity and privacy in a safe, friendly happy environment. Providing support services and information.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 2008: Standard registration
  • 26 November 2024: Funds received from 1168923 TENTERDEN COMMUNITY HUB
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Ian Godfrey Templeton Chair 11 January 2023
None on record
Douglas Francis McWilliams Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Glyn Kerry Moore Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Kenneth Glencross Morrison Trustee 07 September 2023
None on record
Dr DAVID HAROLD HAINSWORTH DODDS Trustee 30 June 2023
None on record
Paul Arthur Wilson Trustee 30 June 2023
None on record
ANDREW JAMES HYNARD Trustee 10 December 2014
THE STORY OF CHRISTMAS
Received: On time
COLIN TREVOR SAUNDERS Trustee 21 March 2013
ROTARY CLUB OF TENTERDEN CHARITABLE PURPOSES FUND
Received: On time
MRS SALLY KLEMEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £670.49k £681.08k £624.82k £616.73k £664.54k
Total expenditure £610.13k £600.68k £712.34k £691.63k £722.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £43.42k £245.71k £45.34k £99.35k
Income - Donations and legacies £378.89k £411.92k £25.58k £198.75k £250.38k
Income - Other trading activities £51.05k £34.00k £60.57k £127.19k £154.90k
Income - Charitable activities £240.27k £235.15k £292.96k £290.76k £257.33k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £9 £0 £24 £7
Income - Other £23.61k £0 £245.71k £0 £1.92k
Income - Legacies £27.72k £16.57k £2.69k £3.90k £490
Expenditure - Charitable activities £608.86k £600.68k £712.05k £691.63k £722.59k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.28k £0 £285 £0 £215
Expenditure - Governance £2.10k £0 £1.98k £1.98k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £435.06k £392.58k £425.61k £370.53k £317.87k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £109.52k £229.96k £124.89k £136.96k £114.80k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £16.27k £13.83k £29.31k £61.20k £44.64k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 March 2024 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 March 2024 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tenterden Social Hub
Church Road
TENTERDEN
Kent
TN30 6AT
Phone:
01580 762882