THE RHONDDA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide grants to individuals and organisations in the Rhondda to improve people's skills, to enhance their education and to provide them with training opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 02 June 2008: Standard registration
- 06 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.23k | £151.52k | £151.72k | £151.79k | £150.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.27k | £100.66k | £117.44k | £160.87k | £376.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 03 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 03 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 12 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 12 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 24 November 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 17 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 17 December 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 7 DECEMBER 2007 AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 9 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
FURTHERING EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITHIN THE RHONDDA FAR AND RHONDDA FAWR VALLEYS (THE RHONDA) IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: I IN AWARDING EDUCATIONAL OR TRAINING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO PEOPLE IN THE RHONDDA WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; II IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO SUCH PERSONS ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATION OR TRAINING ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE THEM FOR OR ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO A TRADE PROFESSION OR SERVICE; III IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS GRANTS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE THEM TO TRAVEL IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD IN FURTHERANCE OF THEIR EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING; IV IN OTHERWISE FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OR SKILLS BASE OF SUCH PERSONS; V IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN HE RHONDDA AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; VI AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION. B THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN THE RHONDDA IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
RHONDDA FAR AND RHONDDA FAWR VALLEYS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window