Financial history MUSIC AND ARTS PRODUCTION LEEDS

Charity Number: 1125303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £275.73k £901.14k £944.88k £669.50k £751.56k
Total expenditure £304.17k £292.94k £422.75k £469.91k £576.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.32k £10.25k £589.16k £101.75k £89.17k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £775.38k £757.82k £374.45k £359.47k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £1.38k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £87.69k £158.35k £274.96k £300.84k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £30.75k £28.71k £20.08k £64.49k
Income - Other N/A £5.94k £0 £0 £26.77k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £262.17k £391.69k £435.55k £522.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £30.78k £31.07k £34.36k £54.19k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £2.09k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0