THE SOCIETY OF THE LITTLE FLOWER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The general objects of the Charity are the advancement of the Roman Catholic Religion, by means of the establishment or furtherance of any charitable works carried on by, or under the control or supervision of members of the Order of Carmelites, and by means of the provision of scholarships and bursaries for the education and training of priests and/or members of the said Order.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Bolivia
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Dominican Republic
- East Timor
- El Salvador
- Germany
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Italy
- Kenya
- Malta
- Mexico
- Mozambique
- Northern Ireland
- Papua New Guinea
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Scotland
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Vietnam
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 03 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Anthony de Groot | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Most Rev. Miceal O'Neill O. Carm | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christian Koerner O. Carm | Trustee | 28 March 2020 |
|
|||||
REV Carl Markelz OCarm | Trustee | 25 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND FATHER ROBERT COLARESI O.CARM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.14m | £1.17m | £744.78k | £167.81k | £48.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £957.05k | £916.88k | £1.02m | £408.03k | £1.60m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.07m | £1.12m | £683.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £35.90k | £44.96k | £51.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £38.33k | £6.74k | £10.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £12.40k | £9.10k | £26.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £141.43k | £134.74k | £289.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £815.63k | £782.14k | £731.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.51k | £9.38k | £12.96k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £129.92k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 DEC 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 NOV 2022 as amended on 28 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AND INCLUDE IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE ESTABLISHMENT, SUPPORT OR FURTHERANCE OF ANY OF THE CHARITABLE WORKS CARRIED ON BY OR UNDER THE CONTROL OR SUPERVISION OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CATHOLIC RELIGIOUS ASSOCIATION OF MEN KNOWN AS THE ORDER OF THE BROTHERS OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY OF MOUNT CARMEL, KNOWN ALSO AS THE ORDER OR CARMELITES OF THE ANCIENT OBSERVANCE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitefriars Presbytery
Tanners Street
FAVERSHAM
Kent
ME13 7JW
- Phone:
- 01403274242
- Email:
- ukweb@littleflower.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window