THE MUMME-ACKFORD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES GRANTS FOR INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
- Antarctica
- Argentina
- Kenya
- Nepal
- Poland
- Romania
Governance
- 19 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUZIE ANNALOUISE MUMME | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ANNE MUMME YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL JOHN ACKFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONA CAROLINE ROCKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.77k | £54.46k | £71.41k | £121.54k | £176.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.94k | £71.73k | £75.00k | £50.00k | £88.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES, FROM TIME TO TIME, SHALL THINK FIT. THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Redlands
Trevose Head
Padstow
Cornwall
PL28 8SL
- Phone:
- 01392 432211
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window