DONCASTER LITTLE THEATRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Doncaster Little Theatre offers various forms of entertainment including, plays, shows and films for the local community. Each year one production is taken on tour to the more deprived areas of Doncaster. The Company also provides drama workshops for adult members, children, young people up to the age of eighteen and community groups and schools. Our aim is to promote all forms of theatre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Doncaster
Governance
- 29 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES BOLUS | Chair | 02 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MEARS | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER ANGELA MEARS | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
TRACY BOLUS | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA UPTON | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR D HODSON | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.60k | £37.24k | £37.42k | £86.99k | £77.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.16k | £40.05k | £55.87k | £75.38k | £83.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.17k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 13 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCING IN DONCASTER AND DISTRICT OF EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR OF THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING, AND PAGEANTS IN THEIR VARIOUS ASPECTS
Area of benefit
DONCASTER AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 KING STREET
EAST LAITH GATE
DONCASTER
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
ENGLAND
DN1 1JD
- Phone:
- 01302340422
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window