PROSPERITY FOUNDATION LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prosperity was established with a view to making donations to other charities, institutions, hospitals and projects which provide treatment or support for children suffering from oncological and haematological diseases
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Georgia
- Germany
- Italy
Governance
- 19 April 2008: Standard registration
- 13 March 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2009 | 28/02/2010 | 28/02/2011 | 28/02/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £1.41k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | 19 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | 21 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2010 | 30 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE DEEMED BY ENGLISH LAW TO BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window