Financial history GREENPATH VENTURES

Charity number: 1124202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.08k £12.02k £26.43k £18.10k £53.63k
Total expenditure £14.25k £11.64k £11.71k £28.90k £34.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.04k N/A N/A