HARVEYS AND JUBILEE HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is an almshouse. It operates a Grade II* listed building known as Harveys containing 8 one bedroomed flats. It also operates 2 one bedroomed bungalows. The former building results from the legacy of Richard Harvey the bungalows replaced four bedsits built to commemorate the diamond jubliee of Queen Victoria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 07 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DICK ARNOLD | Chair |
|
||||||
Garry Frederick Shortland | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Georgina Ann Vye | Trustee | 10 December 2014 |
|
|||||
DR GLANVILL | Trustee | 14 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA DIANE LE TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL EDWARD FROOM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.93k | £50.00k | £50.25k | £49.94k | £54.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.68k | £27.38k | £78.77k | £37.18k | £64.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 22 January 2008 as amended on 5 June 2013
Charitable objects
1) IS THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS WHO A) ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND B) ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES); AND C) ARE, IN THE CASE OF THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS 5 AND 6 JUBILEE CLOSE (THE PROPERTY NUMBERED 1 IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME), NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE OR WHO ARE INFIRM, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS NOT LESS THAN 65 YEARS OF AGE AND ARE OTHERWISE QUALIFIED. 2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 3) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Monmouth Court
CHARD
TA20 1HQ
- Phone:
- 0146065144
- Email:
- a.prior@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window