ST THOMAS BECKET SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING FOR SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Jane Ellis | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tony Armstrong | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Breege Rawlinson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.99k | £26.35k | £12.88k | £10.75k | £30.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.85k | £26.50k | £7.52k | £123 | £16.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CROYDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST THOMAS BECKET SCHOOL
BIRCHANGER ROAD
London
SE25 5BN
- Phone:
- 02086543006
- Email:
- stbsateam@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window