Accounts and annual returns THE GREAT COMMISSION MINISTRY

Charity number: 1123388
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 February 2025 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 February 2025 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 May 2024 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 May 2024 87 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 12 April 2023 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 April 2023 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 16 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window