Financial history THE GREAT COMMISSION MINISTRY

Charity Number: 1123388
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £310.77k £332.48k £326.70k £381.14k £401.14k
Total expenditure £305.79k £201.90k £234.48k £254.76k £269.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A