THE GREAT COMMISSION MINISTRY

Charity number: 1123388
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Great Commission Ministry's main goal is to spread the gospel and see believers grow in faith. In doing so we also meet the practical needs of the community and regurarly help the poor, sick, homeless & elderly. We provide opportunities for basic training to help people be in touch with modern tecnology, and encourage members to use their natural gifts whether it be in music, dance, or drama.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £401,141
Total expenditure: £269,447

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Barking And Dagenham
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Coventry City
  • Derbyshire
  • Hammersmith And Fulham
  • Luton
  • Newham
  • Somerset
  • Surrey
  • France
  • Philippines
  • Spain

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 March 2008: Standard registration
  • 06 July 2011: Funds received from 1056124 THE GREAT COMMISSION MINISTRY
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marife Colis Trustee 20 December 2020
None on record
Felix Perez Trustee 20 December 2020
None on record
Alejandro Romano Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record
Sammy David Bolor Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record
ALMA IBALE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £310.77k £332.48k £326.70k £381.14k £401.14k
Total expenditure £305.79k £201.90k £234.48k £254.76k £269.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 February 2025 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 February 2025 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 May 2024 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 May 2024 87 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 12 April 2023 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 April 2023 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 16 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Shepherds Bush Baptist Church
Shepherds Bush Road
LONDON
W6 7NA
Phone:
02085774437
Email:
No information available
Website:

thegcm.org