BRITISH MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF MERTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BMA Invites its members and other Muslims to lectures, meetings and seminars on the topics relevant to the Muslim community through the involvement of learned scholars and other academics. Following activities took place during June 2010 and March 2011: (1) Building resilience to violent extremism-24.7.10, (2) EID get together-9.10.10, seminar how to combat extremism-27.11.10 and seminar on peacef
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Merton
Governance
- 18 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tasneem Mohammadally Dr | Chair | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Razia Killedar | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amal Bhat | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Waqas Sufi | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shafiq Alim | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Naila Alim | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rubana Q Latif | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
SALEEM ULLAH SHEIKH MBE | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
M Mushtaque Rana | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ikhlaque Ali Shah | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Shuaib Sheikh | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|||||
ex - Cllr Najeeb Latif | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Salma Hashmi | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Latif | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Huma Qureshi | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £587 | £0 | £0 | £651 | £60 | |
|
Total expenditure | £609 | £142 | £50 | £299 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MAY 2008 as amended on 18 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH; 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ISLAMIC CULTURES; AND = 3.3 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS, THE ASSOCIATION MAY: = ESTABLISH AN ISLAMIC CENTRE FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ASSOCIATION; = PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC STUDIES, ETIQUETTE AND THE UNDERSTANDING OF ISLAMIC CULTURE; = ARRANGE ISLAMIC LECTURES, MEETINGS, SEMINARS AND SIMILAR FUNCTIONS OF TOPICS OF INTEREST TO THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY; = ASSIST AND HELP IN THE EVENT OF BEREAVEMENT OF MUSLIMS BY REFERRING THE FAMILIES TO THEAPPROPRIATE BURIAL SERVICES = ORGANISE AND UNDERTAKE SUCH OTHER EVENTS TO PROMOTE THE SPIRIT OF ISLAM AND THE UNDERSTANDING OF ITS DISCIPLINES; = CO-OPERATE AND CREATE UNDERSTANDING WITH OTHER BODIES OF SIMILAR OBJECTIVES WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON AND BEYOND.
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON AND BEYOND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
276 COOMBE LANE
LONDON
SW20 0RW
- Phone:
- 02089466722
- Email:
- ppfsecretary@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window