THE ROAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1122851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants to registered charities in the fields of education, medical research, social welfare, overseas development and other areas where the trustees are agreed that grants will be used effectively.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £248,731
Total expenditure: £562,978

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LADY MARGARET JOAN JARVIS Chair
None on record
SUSAN MARY SWETE Trustee
None on record
TREVOR JOHN SWETE Trustee
None on record
AMELIA JANE HARRIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £283.90k £214.09k £204.30k £178.29k £248.73k
Total expenditure £589.85k £582.28k £544.44k £541.27k £562.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Solid Management
PO Box 2696
Woodford Green
IG8 1UF
Phone:
07771711188