THE JILL MARTIN FUND FOR TORTOISE WELFARE AND CONSERVATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for public benefit relief of the suffering of Tortoises and Turtles through veterinary aid and educational programmes. To the protection and improvement of environment in areas inhabited by Tortoises and Turtles and to collaborate with other voluntary bodies. To providing specialist materials, bursary aid and or relief to deserving students in this field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2017
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Spain
Governance
- 03 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW CHARLES HIGHFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NADINE KAREN HIGHFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2013 | 04/04/2014 | 04/04/2015 | 04/04/2016 | 04/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.63k | £811 | £6.94k | £2.63k | £895 | |
|
Total expenditure | £422 | £216 | £5.32k | £216 | £234 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL TRUST DEED DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 2007, AS AMENDED 7 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF TORTOISES AND TURTLES IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, AND IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS TORTOISES AND TURTLES BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES, OR ILL USAGE; AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG TORTOISES AND TURTLES. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN AREAS INHABITED BY TORTOISES OR TURTLES BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WORKING IN OR INTENDING TO WORK IN THE FIELD OF TORTOISE AND TURTLE RESCUE AND CONSERVATION BY MEANS OF LECTURES, RESEARCH, PUBLISHING EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, HANDS-ON TRAINING; PROVIDING EXTRA FACILITIES AND EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES AT VETERINARY AND RELATED COLLEGES AND INSTITUTIONS, OR LEARNING FACILITIES, TO ALLOW THE SUBJECT TO BE STUDIED EXCEPT INSOFAR AS NO SUCH RESEARCH OR TRAINING SHALL INVOLVE THE COMMISSION OF ANY EXPERIMENT THAT SHALL CAUSE SUFFERING OR HARM TO ANY ANIMAL. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN SOUTH AND CENTRAL AMERICA, AFRICA AND ASIA, OR ANY OTHER DESERVING REGION SO DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME, WHO WORK IN, OR ARE INTENDING TO WORK IN THE FIELD OF WILDLIFE RESCUE AND CONSERVATION, BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH EDUCATIONAL AND PRACTICAL MATERIALS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES NECESSARY TO CARRY OUT SUCH RESCUE AND CONSERVATION ACTIVITIES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 20
Bond Street
West Bromwich
B70 7DQ
- Phone:
- 07542558923
- Email:
- tortoisetrust@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window