Financial history THE ROYAL SIGNALS MUSEUM

Charity Number: 1133304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £253.38k £278.63k £254.82k £251.51k £272.32k
Total expenditure £289.50k £294.00k £255.86k £311.48k £344.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £69.54k N/A £116.70k N/A N/A