THE ROYAL SIGNALS MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MUSEUM ENCOMPASSES A WIDE RANGE OF DIVERSE ACTIVITIES TO GUARANTEE INCOME AND TO GUARANTEE THAT WE CAN MEET THE BROAD RANGE OF RESPONSIBILITIES TO THE ARMY, THE ROYAL CORPS OF SIGNALS AND VISITORS TO THE MUSEUM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Dorset
Governance
- 15 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip James Davies | Chair | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Victor John Brannigan | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Alicia L M Jarman | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Michelle Forster | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca S Jacques-Grey | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Charles Bruce | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SALLY JEAN JONES | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward M Flint | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane M Stockdale | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ARCHIBALD COLIN CUNNINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.38k | £278.63k | £254.82k | £251.51k | £272.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £289.50k | £294.00k | £255.86k | £311.48k | £344.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £69.54k | N/A | £116.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 4 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE CORPS IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY AND TECHNICAL ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE CORPS AND ITS ANTECEDENTS; AND 2) TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL CORPS OF SIGNALS, INCLUDING RELATED TERRITORIAL AND VOLUNTEER BODIES, BY ENCOURAGING RECRUITMENT AND FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS; BY THE RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION ABOUT, AND THE PRESERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF, A COLLECTION AND OTHER MATERIAL LINKED TO THE ROLES, HERITAGE AND ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ROYAL CORPS OF SIGNALS AND RELATED BODIES.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROYAL SIGNALS MUSEUM
BLANDFORD CAMP
BLANDFORD
DORSET
DT11 8RH
- Phone:
- 01258482267
- Email:
- info@royalsignalsmuseum.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window