Trustees THE ROYAL SIGNALS MUSEUM

Charity Number: 1133304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip James Davies Chair 01 July 2020
None on record
Robert Victor John Brannigan Trustee 06 December 2024
DORSET WOODTURNERS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Alicia L M Jarman Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Victoria Michelle Forster Trustee 09 August 2023
None on record
Rebecca S Jacques-Grey Trustee 09 August 2023
None on record
Nicholas Charles Bruce Trustee 30 March 2023
None on record
SALLY JEAN JONES Trustee 28 July 2022
None on record
Edward M Flint Trustee 06 May 2016
None on record
Jane M Stockdale Trustee 06 May 2016
None on record
ARCHIBALD COLIN CUNNINGHAM Trustee
None on record