VOICE OF REVIVAL MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
religious activities- preaching;hospital visitations ;youth activities in partnership with scripture union and helping needy people .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hartlepool
- Leeds City
- Sheffield City
- Throughout London
- Botswana
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 12 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Pfupa | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Wisdom Marufu | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Faith Tembo | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Edmore Ncube | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.26k | £20.10k | £3.79k | £2.47k | £4.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.11k | £20.73k | £14.65k | £1.72k | £4.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 17 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 17 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 May 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LEEDS, SHEFFIELD, LONDON AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Raynville Rise
Bramley
Leeds
Leeds
LS13 2QG
- Phone:
- 01133453151
- Email:
- voiceofrevival365@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window