FELINE FRIENDS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a small, private cat rescue organisation which offers help to the general public with unwanted cats & kittens. We also take in, wherever possible, stray cats and feral cats. We have a strict neutering policy and no animals in our care remain unneutered.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sunderland
Governance
- 13 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNNE WATSON | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN CONNOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.04k | £26.15k | £42.21k | £36.04k | £21.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.17k | £25.84k | £20.89k | £22.23k | £31.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2021
(These accounts |
03 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THEIR RECEPTION AND CARE AND THE TREATMENT OF SICK OR ILL-TREATED CATS AND GENERALLY TO ALLEVIATE SUFFERING OR CRUELTY BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND EDUCATION ON RESPONSIBLE CAT WELFARE AND OWNERSHIP AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, TYNE & WEAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 FULLER ROAD
SUNDERLAND
SR2 8PQ
- Phone:
- 01915678801
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window