THE NEU TRUST FUND LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The NEU Trust Fund Limited gives confidential support and financial assistance. It is there to assist members in times of illness or hardship. The Fund can provide assistance to current members, former members and their dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 December 2008: Standard registration
- THE ATL TRUST FUND LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE NEU TRUST FUND LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kim Knappett | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Dr Bernard Regan | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Hansa Panchal | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Heather Catharine McKenzie | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Ian Wigmore | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Mairead Canavan | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
EDWARD JEREMY GLAZIER | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Judith Elderkin | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Gouveia | Trustee | 08 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen David Ainger | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.62k | £164.37k | £602.65k | £324.27k | £183.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.76k | £213.62k | £177.65k | £244.42k | £324.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £544.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £58.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £457.51k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £145.51k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £12.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £6.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £12.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £19.69k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 MAR 2019 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
2 OBJECTS 2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1.1 THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF POVERTY OF PERSONS WHO ARE: (A) MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION OR PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN SUCH MEMBERS; (B) PERSONS WHO WERE MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION OF TEACHERS AND LECTURERS OR THE NATIONAL UNION OF TEACHERS; AND (C) WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, SURVIVING CIVIL PARTNERS, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS REFERRED TO IN ARTICLES 2.1.1(A) AND 2.1.1(B) WHO ARE COMPLETELY OR MAINLY DEPENDENT FOR FINANCIAL SUPPORT ON THEM IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES. 2.1.2 THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF POVERTY OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE CHILDREN OR DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS REFERRED TO IN ARTICLES 2.1.1(A) AND 2.1.1(B) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL GRANTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 05 December 2008 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wilsons Solicitors Llp
Alexandra House
St. Johns Street
Salisbury
SP1 2SB
- Phone:
- 01722412412
- Email:
- sam.miller@wilsonsllp.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window