CHABAD LUBAVITCH (LEEDS) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing facilities for the practice of the Orthodox Jewish Religion and grantmaking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 February 2024
Total income includes £5,998 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rabbi Michael Dannow | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
RABBI YEREMI ANTONY JAMES ANGYALFI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RABBI REUVEN ZANVILL COHEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHOSHANA JENNIFER GAY ANGYALFI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD ANTHONY BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2020 | 27/02/2021 | 27/02/2022 | 27/02/2023 | 27/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.47k | £41.18k | £13.61k | £17.91k | £78.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.34k | £16.63k | £24.96k | £25.36k | £84.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.82k | N/A | £4.91k | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 February 2024 | 25 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2024 | 25 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2021 | 26 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2021 | 26 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 19 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE PRACTICE OF THE JEWISH RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH ORTHODOX JEWISH TENETS, AND IN PARTICULAR BY ADVANCING AND PROMOTING THE APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS LITERATURE, AND BY FOSTERING THE OBSERVANCE BY MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY OF THE LAWS OF KASHRUT (THE JEWISH DIETARY LAWS) AND 2 TO RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL; HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND/OR MATERIAL HELP TO MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY IN NEED WITHIN THE CITY OF LEEDS AND/OR THE COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE
Area of benefit
CITY OF LEEDS AND/OR THE COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
168 SHADWELL LANE
LEEDS
LS17 8AD
- Phone:
- 01132663311
- Email:
- yangyalfi@judaismlive.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window