Financial history UNITY ENTERPRISES EAST ANGLIA

Charity number: 1124361
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2015 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019
Total gross income £9.96k £9.53k £4.75k £0 £24.50k
Total expenditure £8.85k £9.56k £4.75k £0 £24.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A