DEBT ADVICE NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Debt Advice Network operates a policy of total financial inclusion, assisting people with debt problems. Provides Nationwide cover with local presence and delivers its service face-to-face, in the home or out-reach centres. The majority of its volunteers are CMAP qualified and able to help with any situation, ranging from arrears with utilities to secured loans ÔÇô including mortgage arrears.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 June 2008: Standard registration
- 30 November 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 30 November 2012: Funds transferred to 1144064 THE DEBT ADVICE NETWORK
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 29/02/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.19k | £83.98k | £154.06k | £25.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.98k | £79.42k | £153.58k | £36.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2012 | 17 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2012 | 17 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 21 February 2012 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 09 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 26 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 26 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 28 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FREE DEBT ADVICE TO PERSONS WHO, THROUGH LACK OF MEANS AND/OR KNOWLEDGE WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO RESOLVE THEIR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MORTGAGE AND FINANCIAL ADVISORS ON THE ALTERNATIVE SOLUTIONS THAT CAN BE OFFERED TO PERSONS WHO ARE KNOWN TO HAVE PAYMENT DIFFICULTIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window