AGENTS GIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of need amongst those who are homeless or at risk of homelessness. Any other purposes that are exclusively charitable according to the law of England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 June 2008: Standard registration
- THE ESTATE AGENCY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Luther Bradbury | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Craig Campbell | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Iain Henry McKenzie | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Whale | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcus St John Whewell | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Russell Emerson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Paula Gardner | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Giltinan | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Samples | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Spencer Lawrence | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN TALBOT KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID NEWNES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.06k | £48.40k | £133.47k | £195.76k | £189.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.70k | £54.06k | £101.56k | £154.66k | £193.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.47k | £4.87k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2024 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/04/2014
Charitable objects
1)THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A MAKING GRANTS FOR THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS; B CONDUCTING STUDY AND RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF HOMELESSNESS AND PUBLISHING AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. 2) ANY OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
Gateway House
Tollgate
Chandlers Ford
Eastleigh
SO53 3TG
- Phone:
- 07971251593
- Email:
- S3M430@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window