Trustees AGENTS GIVING
Charity number: 1124410

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Luther Bradbury | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Craig Campbell | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Iain Henry McKenzie | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Whale | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcus St John Whewell | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Russell Emerson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Paula Gardner | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Giltinan | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Samples | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Spencer Lawrence | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN TALBOT KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID NEWNES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.