CHANGE AFRICA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Currently renovating existing building in Kisumu of Western Kenya,in order to bring to a satisfactory standard for use as an orphanage home/community centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kenya
Governance
- 26 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH ANYANGO FRANCIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Samwel Omoga | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
COLLINS OTIENDE SIJENYI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROLAND FRANK FRANCIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.42k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED 10 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE IN AFRICA. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE WHO HAVE BEEN DISPLACED FROM THEIR COUNTRY DUE TO WAR, OR NATURAL DISASTER, OR TROUBLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING TO SUCH PEOPLE. TO INCREASE AWARENESS AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO H.I.V. AIDS, AND TO RELIEVE RELATED SICKNESS AMONGST THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PEOPLE IN AFRICA.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Wendover Way
ORPINGTON
BR6 0US
- Phone:
- 01689891700
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window