CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY SOUND OF THE TRUMPET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE HOLDING OF TWICE WEEKLY WORSHIP SERVICES. THESE ARE DESIGNED TO DEMONSTRATE TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF SPIRITUAL EMPOWERMENT THROUGH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Angola
- Congo
- France
- Ghana
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Nigeria
- Spain
Governance
- 14 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DANIEL MAXIMILIANO NKEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANDRE KIESSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHANTAL MANUNGA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/01/2020 | 03/01/2021 | 03/01/2022 | 03/01/2023 | 03/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.82k | £4.11k | £4.83k | £4.89k | £7.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.23k | £4.01k | £4.54k | £4.68k | £6.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 January 2024 | 19 January 2025 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 January 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 January 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 January 2020 | 08 December 2020 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 FEBRUARY 2008.
Charitable objects
3. NAME & OBJECTS 3.1 THE NAME OF THE ORGANISATION IS CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY SOUND OF THE TRUMPET. 3.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 3.2.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 3.2.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.2.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 3.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE ORGANISATION IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 6
369-371 CAMDEN ROAD
LONDON
N7 0SH
- Phone:
- 00442034890957
- Email:
- freshfirehelp@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window