GLOBAL AID TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Global Aid Trust is an education based charity which has been sponsoring orphans covering their cost of living and education. It has been helping the poor and responding the emergency. It has women empowerment programme, Cataract Operations project, Cyclone Centre and Educational Complex in Bangladesh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 10 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ASM ASHRAF MAHMUD | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
TARIK NASRULLAH | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MD ZIAUL HAQUE | Trustee | 10 April 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.89k | £331.20k | £182.55k | £168.51k | £179.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.71k | £286.74k | £171.20k | £210.76k | £140.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 DECEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED ON 16 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SERVICES, FACILITIES OR FUNDING AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS BY THE PROVISION OF HEALTH FACILITIES. 3. TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF MONEY OR SERVICES. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SERVICES, FACILITIES OR FUNDING AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 5. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF VULNERABLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 8
80a Ashfield Street
LONDON
E1 2BJ
- Phone:
- 02074227551
- Email:
- info@globalaid.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window