CANSS LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educate in cannabis prevention. Special emphasis on "skunk" cannabis, in relation to children/teenagers.Provide support/advice to users/families.Promote prevention/abstinence from cannabis use by publishing/making public literature on cannabis.Educate general public of the effects of cannabis misuse/contribute to research into the greater understanding of the nature and extent of cannabis misuse
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 August 2008: Standard registration
- 26 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TALKING ABOUT CANNABIS (Previous name)
- TALKING ABOUT CANNABIS LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.21k | £7.65k | £6.22k | £5.07k | £4.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.84k | £9.51k | £8.85k | £7.91k | £4.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 13 October 2020 | 251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 05 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED 17 JULY 2008 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATE 12 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE 3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN CANNABIS PREVENTION, WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON THE STRONGER STRAINS COMMONLY KNOWN AS 'SKUNK' CANNABIS, IN RELATION TO CHILDREN AND TEENAGERS. 3.2 TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING CAUSED BY CANNABIS USE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO USERS AND THEIR FAMILIES. 3.3 TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION AND ABSTINENCE FROM CANNABIS USE BY PUBLISHING AND MAKING PUBLIC LITERATURE ON CANNABIS. 3.4 TO PROMOTE AWARENESS AMONGST THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE EFFECTS OF CANNABIS MISUSE AND TO CONTRIBUTE TO RESEARCH INTO THE GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF THE NATURE AND EXTENT OF CANNABIS MISUSE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window