Financial history RALEIGH LTD

Charity Number: 1123687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £50.00k £100.00k £50.00k £50.00k £60.00k
Total expenditure £122.00k £89.81k £70.17k £73.67k £69.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A