INDIAN INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY - ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IITUK ORGANISES CONFERENCES AND NETWORK EVENTS OF ITS MEMBERS AND SEEKS TO RAISE FUNDS FOR ITS CHARITABLE PURPOSE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- India
Governance
- 13 October 2008: Standard registration
- IIT LC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arun Kumar Ravikumar | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajkamal Srivastava | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abin Thomas | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ritu Goswami Kataky | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jiwan Jain | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lalatendu Dash | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yusuf Jazakallah | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shankar Meembat | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr RAJEEV WASUDEO BENODEKAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR RAJ KRISHAN JAIN PHD CMATHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AJAY CHAUDHARY BE MTECH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.91k | £64.24k | £40.46k | £120.65k | £39.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.16k | £58.80k | £32.03k | £113.24k | £39.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 04/07/2011 as amended on 24 Jan 2021 as amended on 08 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS IN FINANCIAL NEED BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL GRANTS TO INDIAN INSTITUTES OF TECHNOLOGY (THE IITS) TO ENABLE THEM TO STUDY AT THE IITS. TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR THE NEWLY ARRIVED IIT ALUMNI IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THEIR INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY AND THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND EUROPEAN AND IN INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
60A Goddington Lane
ORPINGTON
Kent
BR6 9DS
- Phone:
- 01689606131
- Email:
- charity@iituk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window