ABC TRAINING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO INTRODUCE PEOPLE TO THE SPORT OF CLIMBING IN A STRUCTURED AND EDUCATIONAL MANNER. TO ADVISE AND TRAIN STAFF ON ARTIFICIAL CLIMBING STRUCTURES IN INSTRUCTIONAL AND COACHING TECHNIQUES AND TO PROMOTE THE SPORT TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC.TO FOSTER CLOSE RELATIONSHIPS WITH THE RELEVANT NATIONAL GOVERNING BODIES AND TRAINING ORGANISATIONS OF THE SPORT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £43,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Czech Republic
- Dubai
- Guernsey
- Hong Kong
- Ireland
- Jersey
- Scotland
- Switzerland
Governance
- 10 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Allan Bird | Chair | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Chong | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juan Carlos Avendano | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Cowley | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rotimi James Odukoya | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Brian Garner | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edward Chittenden | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Edward Tapping | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.87k | £80.39k | £196.67k | £204.12k | £222.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.85k | £143.35k | £146.49k | £227.47k | £260.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.00k | £34.00k | £29.00k | £43.00k | £43.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/2014 as amended on 25 Apr 2018 as amended on 25 Sep 2020 as amended on 10 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
A PROMOTE SAFETY AND COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND SPORT; B ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH A NON-EXCLUSIVE FOCUS ON CLIMBING AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES BY IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) PROVIDING A NATIONALLY-RECOGNISED ACCREDITATION SCHEME TO INDIVIDUALS PARTICIPATING IN CLIMBING ON ARTIFICIAL CLIMBING STRUCTURES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Ground Floor
66 High Street
Lewes
East Sussex
BN7 1XG
- Phone:
- 03007729872
- Email:
- admin@nicas.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window