Governing document ABC TRAINING TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/2014 as amended on 25 Apr 2018 as amended on 25 Sep 2020 as amended on 10 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
A PROMOTE SAFETY AND COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND SPORT; B ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH A NON-EXCLUSIVE FOCUS ON CLIMBING AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES BY IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) PROVIDING A NATIONALLY-RECOGNISED ACCREDITATION SCHEME TO INDIVIDUALS PARTICIPATING IN CLIMBING ON ARTIFICIAL CLIMBING STRUCTURES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.