Trustees ABC TRAINING TRUST
Charity number: 1123559

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Allan Bird | Chair | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Chong | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juan Carlos Avendano | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Cowley | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rotimi James Odukoya | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Brian Garner | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edward Chittenden | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Edward Tapping | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.