Financial history THE RISMAN FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1123010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £261.81k £9.38m £15.64m £25.08m £2.26m
Total expenditure £18.48k £63.99k £100.04k £136.69k £388.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £9.38m £15.63m £25.00m £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £7.21k £11.02k £79.24k £2.26m
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £63.99k £100.04k £136.69k £388.91k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.12k £5.94k £5.64k £45.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £93.52k £0 £342.05k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0