YOU TOUCH AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Assist volunteer teachers & nurses to work in Africa -Building and assisting Vocational Training Centres, -Assisting Micro-Credit Union, -Assisting women in setting up chicken farming project -Building and renovation of Schools and Hospitals -Establishing Computer Learning Centers -Improving diet in Primary Schools -Supply Educational & Medical Material All projects are carried in Africa
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Tanzania
Governance
- 05 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Mutesi | Trustee | 20 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jane Njeri Kimaru | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW PAUL GIBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev ARBOGAST LUCAS LEKULE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOHN JOSEPH MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID HENLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN DUNKIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/03/2020 | 26/03/2021 | 26/03/2022 | 26/03/2023 | 26/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.02k | £4.39k | £4.73k | £5.94k | £15.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82k | £19.01k | £1.30k | £12.98k | £12.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 March 2023 | 10 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED (DATED) 27 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH AND OLD AGE AMONGST DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE LIVING IN AFRICA TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND ADULTS LIVING IN AFRICA TO RELIEVES FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN AFRICA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
26A MITCHAM PARK
MITCHAM
CR4 4EG
- Phone:
- 07595770244
- Email:
- post@youtouchafrica.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window