ESSEX YOUTHBUILD

Charity Number: 1124657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Essex Youthbuild works with young people aged 11-19 years from across Essex, many of whom are in some way disadvantaged. Essex Youthbuild provides training in construction skills alongside mentoring and support to help these young people gain qualifications and move on to the next step in their lives.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £92,717
Total expenditure: £170,746

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wade Tunstall Trustee 08 February 2024
None on record
Patrick Joseph Brennan Trustee 08 December 2020
None on record
JANET MARY TARBUN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £239.25k £288.84k £289.21k £109.21k £92.72k
Total expenditure £229.54k £224.45k £275.80k £202.80k £170.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £50.00k £35.77k
Income from government grants N/A £29.00k N/A N/A £21.17k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 March 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 March 2023 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Essex Youthbuild
Unit 8
Hoffmanns Way
CHELMSFORD
CM1 1GU
Phone:
01245264177