Accounts and annual returns CLOTHES IN NEED LIMITED

Charity number: 1124260
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2015 08 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2014 23 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 23 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2013 19 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2013 19 December 2013 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2012 27 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2012 27 December 2012 On Time