JESUS CHRIST FOUNDATION MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To fulfil our purpose, the organisation provide various types of social and educational services that are guided and inspired by the Gospel values and Christ social teachings: love your neighbour as yourself. Currently the organisation is running two projects: 1. Church in ghana
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hackney
- Ghana
Governance
- 19 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL NII NTIAKU BRUCE | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY AFRIFA | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND PAUL KWASI BREFO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.23k | £30.75k | £36.53k | £49.46k | £46.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.98k | £29.46k | £36.32k | £39.58k | £38.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD; TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD; AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
GLOBAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 9J
13 Eley Road
LONDON
N18 3BB
- Phone:
- 02088870200
- Email:
- jcfmichurch@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window